This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2016 at 07:33:05 (UTC).

BMT, LLC VS. ALEMAN, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 02/22/2013 BMT, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ALEMAN, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DIANA SUMMERHAYES and DOUGLAS HAIGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0302

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DIANA SUMMERHAYES

DOUGLAS HAIGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMT LLC

Defendants

ALEMAN JOSE LUIS

ALEMAN JOSE LUIS DBA AUTO MECHANIC ELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIEBAERT & ASSOCIATES - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

LIEBAERT & ASSOCIATES - H. G. LONG ESQ

Attorney at LIEBAERT & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOB , HON. DOUGLAS HAIGH, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * IN DEPARTMENT SOB AT 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * FUTURE HEARING DATE(S) REMAIN THE SAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM13Q00302 TO LB 13Q00302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 00N , HON. DIANA SUMMERHAYES PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: CAUSE IS CALLED FOR TRIAL. A STIPULATED JUDGMENT IS LODGED WITH THE COURT THIS DATE. AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL OR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IS SET TO 05/23/13 AT 9:00 A.M. IN THIS DEPARTMENT. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/23/13 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 00N .

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2013
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BMT, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF COURT TRIAL: CANNOT PROCESS DOCUMENT BECAUSE DEFENDANT JOSE LUIS ALEMAN DBA AUTO MECHANIC ELECTRIC HAS NOT BEEN DEFAULTED OR DISMISSED. THANK YOU! SUBMITTED ON 03/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO SEE DEFAULT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • ANSWER - PAID RECEIVED AS TO (ALEMAN, JOSE LUIS) , (ALEMAN, JOSE LUIS DBA AUTO MECHANIC ELECTRIC) . PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ALEMAN, JOSE LUIS) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF JOHN BOUZANE - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE