Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 13:03:41 (UTC).

BMC WEST LLC, VS JL GAETA CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by BMC WEST LLC against JL GAETA CONSTRUCTION, INC 'S in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1606

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMC WEST LLC

Defendants

JL GAETA CONSTRUCTION INC.'S

SANDOVAL JOY

JUNIOR GAETA INC

JUNIOR GATA INC DBA J L GAETA CONSTRUCTION

GAETA SR. JOSE LUIS

SANDOVAL ROBYN

SANDOVAL GILBERT A.

THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

JUNIOR GAETA INC DBA J L GAETA CONSTRUCTION

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Mailing - Declaration of Mailing on Withdrawal of Lis Pendens

10/29/2018: Declaration of Mailing - Declaration of Mailing on Withdrawal of Lis Pendens

Summons - on Complaint

9/10/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/29/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens

9/20/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing on Withdrawal of Lis Pendens; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BMC West LLC, on 09/10/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by BMC West LLC, as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Junior Gaeta, Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 09/24/2018; Service Cost: 60.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: JL Gaeta Construction, INC.'s (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/24/2018; Service Cost: 63.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Junior Gaeta, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/24/2018; Service Cost: 45.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: The Western Surety Company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/24/2018; Service Cost: 60.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Junior Gaeta, Inc (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Junior Gata, Inc to Junior Gaeta, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Luis Gaeta Sr. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2018; Service Cost: 63.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: JL Gaeta Construction, INC.'s (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BMC West LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less