Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 21:55:12 (UTC).

BMC WEST, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 BMC WEST, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0600

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMC WEST LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

SEMLER MALIBU AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

SEMLER MALIBU ESTATE VINEYARDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC DBA MALIBU WINE SAFARIS

SELMER COMPANIES AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

APANIAN MILENE C.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens

1/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/22/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC (Defendant); SEMLER MALIBU ESTATE VINEYARDS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC (Defendant); SEMLER MALIBU ESTATE VINEYARDS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC (Defendant); SEMLER MALIBU ESTATE VINEYARDS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMC WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BUCKET LIST EXPERIENCES LLC DBA MALIBU WINE SAFARIS is a litigant

Latest cases where SEMLER MALIBU ESTATE VINEYARDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer APANIAN MILENE