This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2017 at 10:45:07 (UTC).

BLANCA VASQUEZ VS THREE KINGS OF QUEEN INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 BLANCA VASQUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THREE KINGS OF QUEEN INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3160

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ BLANCA

Downey, CA 90242

Defendants

EXCELLENCE REAL ESTATE INC.

12428 Morning Ave,

Downey, CA 90242

CARNET SANDRA M.

Downey, CA 90242

PSOWENCO INC. AKA CENTURY 21 AKA MAXRES INC.

4400 Biscayne Blvd, #850

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

THREE KINGS OF QUEEN INC.

4400 Biscayne Blvd, #850

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

MARTINEZ BRISA

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

RAMIREZ LISA BERNADETTE

Downey, CA 90242

ADAMS GREGG

West Hollywood, CA 90069

HONIG BARRY

West Hollywood, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

7/24/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/30/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/12/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2017

9/29/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2017

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/24/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/29/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 09/29/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Brisa Martinez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 9/14/17; Service Cost: 5.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Barry Honig (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 9/14/17; Service Cost: 5.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Gregg Adams (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 9/14/17; Service Cost: 5.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Excellence Real Estate Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 5.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 9/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Psowenco Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 9/14/17; Service Cost: 5.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service): Result: Granted; As To Parties: Lisa Bernadette Ramirez (Defendant), Gregg Adams (Defendant), Three Kings Of Queen Inc. (Defendant), Brisa Martinez (Defendant), Sandra M. Carnet (Defendant), Psowenco Inc. (Defendant), Excellence Real Estate Inc. (Defendant), Barry Honig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Blanca Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Three Kings Of Queen Inc. (Defendant); Barry Honig (Defendant); Brisa Martinez (Defendant); Sandra M. Carnet (Defendant); Gregg Adams (Defendant); Lisa Bernadette Ramirez (Defendant); Psowenco Inc. (Defendant); Excellence Real Estate Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0012187 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.