Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 11:01:23 (UTC).

BLANCA RAIN VS KELLY ROGERS

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 BLANCA RAIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KELLY ROGERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1978

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAIN BLANCA

Palmdale, CA 93550

Defendant

ROGERS KELLY

Palmdale, CA 93550

 

Court Documents

(Amended)

2/7/2018: (Amended)

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

2/14/2018: Unknown

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

2/20/2018: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Unknown

2/7/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Blanca Rain (Plaintiff); Kelly Rogers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of moving party, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/24/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Status Date changed from 02/20/2018 to 02/14/2018; Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Kelly Rogers (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Blanca Rain (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Rogers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Blanca Rain (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Rogers (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Blanca Rain (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Rogers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Blanca Rain (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Rogers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less