This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 01:05:54 (UTC).

BLANCA L ZELAYA VS EL GUERO AUTO SALES INC.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2016 BLANCA L ZELAYA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EL GUERO AUTO SALES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1554

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZELAYA BLANCA L

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Defendant

EL GUERO AUTO SALES INC.

3116 W. Rosecrans Ave

Hawthorne, CA 90250

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/15/2016

9/15/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/15/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/15/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/7/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

11/28/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/28/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/28/2016: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/28/2016

11/28/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/28/2016

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/28/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/22/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketCase reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Blanca L Zelaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketAddress for Blanca L Zelaya (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/28/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 11/28/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Blanca L Zelaya on 07/22/2016: Defendant El Guero Auto Sales Inc. does not owe the plaintiff Blanca L Zelaya any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: El Guero Auto Sales Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/15/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued to 11/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Blanca L Zelaya (Plaintiff); As to: El Guero Auto Sales Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Blanca L Zelaya (Plaintiff); As to: El Guero Auto Sales Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0002153 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EL GUERO AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant