This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 19:03:58 (UTC).

BLANCA E. LOPEZ VS ERIC ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 BLANCA E LOPEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ERIC ALVARADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2458

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ BLANCA E.

Defendant

ALVARADO ERIC

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff Blanca E. Lopez against Defendant Eric Alvarado.

12/3/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff Blanca E. Lopez against Defendant Eric Alvarado.

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/9/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Eric Alvarado)

10/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Eric Alvarado)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/16/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

10/16/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/16/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of possession

12/26/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

12/19/2018: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketWrit of possession; Filed by: Blanca E. Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Blanca E. Lopez (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff Blanca E. Lopez against Defendant Eric Alvarado. Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Blanca E. Lopez against Defendant Eric Alvarado on the Complaint filed by Blanca E. Lopez on 10/16/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 2956 Battram St., Pomona, CA 91767 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 12/26/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to West Covina Courthouse in Department 6 - Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Eric Alvarado; On the Complaint filed by Blanca E. Lopez on 10/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Blanca E. Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Alvarado (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Eric Alvarado; On the Complaint filed by Blanca E. Lopez on 10/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 10/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca E. Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Alvarado (Defendant); Service Date: 10/16/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Blanca E. Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Alvarado (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Blanca E. Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Eric Alvarado (Defendant) to Eric Alvarado (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less