This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2019 at 09:44:43 (UTC).

BLACK SEA VENTURE MANAGEMENT VS ASTA PACIFIC HEALTHCARE CORP.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 BLACK SEA VENTURE MANAGEMENT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASTA PACIFIC HEALTHCARE CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1613

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLACK SEA VENTURE MANAGEMENT DBA OLYMPUS THERAPY SOLUTIONS

Defendant

ASTA PACIFIC HEALTHCARE CORP. DBA A.C. HOME HEALTH

 

Court Documents

Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims) - Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

8/15/2019: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims) - Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Robert Karabelnik (unsigned)

8/15/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Robert Karabelnik (unsigned)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service Christina Mitchell, Person in charge at time of service

8/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service Christina Mitchell, Person in charge at time of service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/15/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/15/2019

8/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/15/2019

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

5/29/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

5/29/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

5/29/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Robert Karabelnik (unsigned): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service Christina Mitchell, Person in charge at time of service; Filed by: Black Sea Venture Management (Plaintiff); As to: Asta Pacific Healthcare Corp. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/2019; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketFictitious Business Name (Small Claims); Filed by: Black Sea Venture Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 08/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Black Sea Venture Management DBA Olympus Therapy Solutions against Defendant Asta Pacific Healthcare Corp. DBA A.C. Home Health on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Black Sea Venture Management on 05/29/2019 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $109.00 for a total of $2,109.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Robert Karabelnik (unsigned); Filed by: Black Sea Venture Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Black Sea Venture Management (Plaintiff); As to: Asta Pacific Healthcare Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASTA PACIFIC HEALTHCARE CORPORATION is a litigant