This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 05:27:45 (UTC).

BJ PARTY SUPPLIES LLC VS HEALTH CARE PARTNERS INC.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 BJ PARTY SUPPLIES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HEALTH CARE PARTNERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BJ PARTY SUPPLIES LLC

Defendants

HEALTH CARE PARTNERS INC.

HERRERA PEDRO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

2/4/2020: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1/21/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: BJ Party Supplies LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by BJ Party Supplies LLC on 01/02/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/04/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BJ Party Supplies LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Pedro Herrera (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/21/2020; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BJ Party Supplies LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2020; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BJ Party Supplies LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant); Pedro Herrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BJ Party Supplies LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant) to Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant) to Health Care Partners Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant