This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 03:38:05 (UTC).

BILLIE ALLEN VS SAL FRAUSTO

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 BILLIE ALLEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAL FRAUSTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1565

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN BILLIE

Defendant

FRAUSTO SAL DBA L.A. NTX LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/25/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • Hearing11/24/2020 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Billie Allen (Plaintiff); As to: Sal Frausto (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: Document changed from Proof of Service - No Service to Proof of Personal Service; As To Parties changed from Sal Frausto (Defendant) to Sal Frausto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Billie Allen (Plaintiff); As to: Sal Frausto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Billie Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Billie Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 09/25/2020 to 09/25/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 11/24/2020 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less