This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 11:00:11 (UTC).

BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO, A PARTENERSHIP VS HOSSEIN NAHIDI

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO, A PARTENERSHIP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOSSEIN NAHIDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1394

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO A PARTENERSHIP COMP OF HASHEM MINAIY & LEO CHU

Defendant

NAHIDI HOSSEIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

10/29/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/29/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/29/2020

10/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/29/2020

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/29/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

10/29/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/24/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/12/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

4/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/11/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/11/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOther - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bicycle Hotel and Casino, a partenership on 03/11/2020 as follows: Defendant Hossein Nahidi does not owe the plaintiff Bicycle Hotel and Casino, a partnership & Leo Chu, COMP OF Hashem Minaiy any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Statement of Decision is attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOther - Exhibits Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 10/29/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/20/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bicycle Hotel and Casino, a partenership (Plaintiff); As to: Hossein Nahidi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO is a litigant