This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:26:38 (UTC).

BEVERLY HILLS DENTAL LABORATORY, INC. VS DR. SHERRI SCOTT DDS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BEVERLY HILLS DENTAL LABORATORY, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DR SHERRI SCOTT DDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3535

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLY HILLS DENTAL LABORATORY INC.

Defendant

DR. SHERRI SCOTT DDS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/29/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Beverly Hills Dental Laboratory, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Beverly Hills Dental Laboratory, Inc. on 12/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Beverly Hills Dental Laboratory, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Beverly Hills Dental Laboratory, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sherri Scott DDS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/19/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Beverly Hills Dental Laboratory, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sherri Scott DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less