This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 19:43:30 (UTC).

BETH LOPEZ, ET AL. VS CARNIGE SCHOOLS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 BETH LOPEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARNIGE SCHOOLS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2541

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ BETH

Whittier, CA 90602

ALDAMA MARY

Whittier, CA 90602

Defendants

CALVARY BAPTIST CHURCH

6548 Newlin Avenue,

Whittier, CA 90601

CARNIGE SCHOOLS LLC

8775 Magnolia Ave,

Riverside, CA 92503

PASHKO DR. ELIZABETH

Riverside, CA 92503

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

11019 Valley Home Avenue,

Whittier, CA 90603

WHITTIER CHRISTIAN SCHOOL

11700 Maybrook,

Whittier, CA 90604

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/31/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/31/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

7/31/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/31/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/31/2018

7/31/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/31/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/31/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/3/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/3/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/3/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/29/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Lowell Joint School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Calvary Baptist Church (Defendant); Whittier Christian School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Whittier Christian School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/31/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 07/31/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Beth Lopez (Plaintiff); Mary Aldama (Plaintiff); As to: Lowell Joint School District (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Beth Lopez (Plaintiff); Mary Aldama (Plaintiff); As to: Whittier Christian School (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Beth Lopez (Plaintiff); Mary Aldama (Plaintiff); As to: Calvary Baptist Church (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Beth Lopez (Plaintiff); Mary Aldama (Plaintiff); As to: Carnige Schools LLC (Defendant); Dr. Elizabeth Pashko (Defendant); Lowell Joint School District (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant