This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 09:26:28 (UTC).

BERT'S GARAGE INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CONTEST PROMOTIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BERT'S GARAGE INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONTEST PROMOTIONS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1807

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERT'S GARAGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MEDIACOM INC.

KRANTZ SCOTT

CONTEST PROMOTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OURFALIAN RAFI ANTRANIK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/22/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

9/14/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/14/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Bert's Garage Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bert's Garage Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Krantz (Defendant); Service Date: 10/03/2017; Service Cost: 29.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bert's Garage Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MEDIACOM, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/03/2017; Service Cost: 58.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Bert's Garage Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Contest Promotions LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/2017; Service Cost: 58.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bert's Garage Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Contest Promotions LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bert's Garage Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Contest Promotions NY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDIACOM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OURFALIAN RAFI ANTRANIK