This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 01:18:50 (UTC).

BERTA ALICIA SOLORIO VS CESAR UBALDO URIBE

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 BERTA ALICIA SOLORIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR UBALDO URIBE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2712

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLORIO BERTA ALICIA

Defendant

URIBE CESAR UBALDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SNYDER KENNETH LEWIS ESQ.

SNYDER KENNETH

SNYDER KENNETH L

Defendant Attorneys

DRAPEKIN PERRY ALLISON ESQ.

LASICKA PERRY A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)

10/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff

10/4/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

9/20/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/7/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL (AND RELATED MOTION | DISCOVERY DATES)

5/28/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL (AND RELATED MOTION | DISCOVERY DATES)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/3/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/19/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/19/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

11/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/25/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 03/02/2020

3/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 03/02/2020

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/23/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/23/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: Filed By: Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff; Filed by: Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff: As To Parties changed from Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant) to Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff,, Filed by Attorney Kenneth L. Snyder scheduled for 10/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/04/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: Name Extension: for Plaintiff; As To Parties changed from Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant) to Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: As To Parties changed from Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant) to Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Kenneth Lewis Snyder, Esq. (Attorney): First Name changed from Kenneth to Kenneth; Last Name changed from Snyder to Snyder; Organization Name changed from Law Office of Kenneth L. Snyder, APC to Law Office of Kenneth L Snyder APC; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name changed from L to Lewis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAddress for Kenneth Lewis Snyder, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Berta Alicia Solorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 19STLC02712 Hearing Date: October 4, 2021 Dept: 26

Solorio v. Uribe, et\r\nal. 19STLC02712

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Motion of Kenneth L. Snyder, Esq.\r\nof Law Office of Kenneth L, Snyder, APC, to be Relieved as Counsel for\r\nPlaintiff Berta Alicia Solorio, is GRANTED. THE PROPOSED ORDER HAS BEEN\r\nSUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE DEMONTRATING\r\nSERVICE OF THE SIGNED AND CORRECTED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

'

Case Number: 19STLC02712    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 26

Solorio v. Uribe, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Cesar Ubaldo Uribe’s Motion Compelling Plaintiff Berta Alicia Solorio To Respond To Special Interrogatories, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS ALSO TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $210.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Cesar Ubaldo Uribe (“Defendant”) propounded Special Interrogatories, Set One, on Plaintiff Berta Alicia Solorio (“Plaintiff”) on May 7, 2019. (Motion, Lasicka Decl., ¶2 and Exh. A.) To date, no verified responses have been served. (Id. at ¶8.)

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Based on the foregoing, Defendant is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to serve verified responses without objections.

Plaintiff’s failure to timely respond also constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of this motion. The request for sanctions is granted against Plaintiff in the amount of $210.00 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $150.00 and the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Lasicka Decl., ¶10.) The sanctions are to be paid within 30 days this order.

Defendant Cesar Ubaldo Uribe’s Motion Compelling Plaintiff Berta Alicia Solorio To Respond To Special Interrogatories, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS ALSO TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $210.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties may submit via email Monday by 10 a.m.

Case Number: 19STLC02712    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC, rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The unopposed Motion is GRANTED. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (CRC 3.1362(e).) The Order on this Motion will not be effective “until proof of service of a copy of the signed order on [Plaintiff] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

I. Analysis & Order

On August 23, 2019, Counsel for Plaintiff Berta Alicia Solorio (“Counsel”) filed a Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”).

The court may order that an attorney be changed or substituted at any time before or after judgment or final determination upon request by either client or attorney and after notice from one to the other. (CCP § 284(2).) “The determination whether to grant or deny a motion to withdraw as counsel lies within the sound discretion of the trial court.” (Manfredi & Levine v. Superior Court (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 1128, 1133.) An application to be relieved as counsel must be made on Judicial Counsel Forms MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). (CRC 3.1362(a), (c), (e).) The requisite forms must be served “on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (Id. 3.1362(d).)

Counsel seeks to be relieved because there has been of attorney-client communication between Counsel and Plaintiff. Counsel has served the required moving papers on Plaintiff at her current address after confirming the address via telephone and conversation. (MC-052, Item No. 3; Proof of Service attached to MC-051.) The Court is satisfied with Counsel’s reasoning for seeking to be relieved and finds that Counsel has satisfied the requirements of CRC 3.1362(a), (c)-(e). Trial is not scheduled until September 15, 2020, so Plaintiff has sufficient time to find new counsel.

The unopposed Motion is, accordingly, GRANTED. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (CRC 3.1362(e).) The Order on this Motion will not be effective “until proof of service of a copy of the signed order on [Plaintiff] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LASICKA PERRY A