This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 09:59:28 (UTC).

BERNADEAN ROSS VS GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 BERNADEAN ROSS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7926

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSS BERNADEAN

Bellflower, CA 90706

Defendants

GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER

1350 West 177Th Street,

Gardena, CA 90248

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

333 S. Beaudry St, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

2/27/2018: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

1/3/2018: Other - - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Other - - Statement of Decision

12/22/2017: Other - - Statement of Decision

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/22/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/22/2017

12/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/22/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000] - (VIA FAX)

10/6/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000] - (VIA FAX)

Notice of Postponement

10/6/2017: Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/25/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

9/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/16/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Other - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Other - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/21/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by BERNADEAN ROSS on 09/12/2017 as follows: Defendants Los Angeles Unified School District; GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER do not owe the plaintiff BERNADEAN ROSS any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party to 12/21/2017 08:30 AM at 12/21/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) (VIA FAX); Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BERNADEAN ROSS (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BERNADEAN ROSS (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA EARLY EDUCATION CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: BERNADEAN ROSS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant