This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 18:25:21 (UTC).

BERKEHAKIMI VS ERASMO UNDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 BERKEHAKIMI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERASMO UNDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4983

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERKEHAKIMI

Defendants

HERNANDEZ ANTHONY

UNDA ERASMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAKIMI HELGA

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/15/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/25/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/25/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;) of 02/17/2022

2/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;) of 02/17/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JEFF BERKE RE OSC HEARING RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/14/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JEFF BERKE RE OSC HEARING RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing) - Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/4/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing) - Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal;) of 02/17/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/07/2022 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF JEFF BERKE RE OSC HEARING RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: BerkeHakimi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BerkeHakimi (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Hernandez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/08/2020; Service Cost: 78.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BerkeHakimi (Plaintiff); As to: Erasmo Unda (Defendant); Service Date: 06/25/2020; Service Cost: 78.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BerkeHakimi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BerkeHakimi (Plaintiff); As to: Erasmo Unda (Defendant); Anthony Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BerkeHakimi (Plaintiff); As to: Erasmo Unda (Defendant); Anthony Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAKIMI HELGA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKE JEFF ESQ.