This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 11:12:49 (UTC).

BERG, JUDITH VS ORR, MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 BERG, JUDITH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ORR, MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1133

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERG JUDITH

BERG SANDRA

Defendants

ORR MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN

ORR MARY RACHEL

Assignees

FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA FIDELITY CREDITOR SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SZKOLNIK, FRED M.

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

Assignee Attorney

KENNEDY MATTHEW FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

11/16/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

9/18/2017: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Assignment of Judgment

10/27/2017: Assignment of Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/10/2017: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Writ - Return - / Costs: $120.00

8/7/2018: Writ - Return - / Costs: $120.00

Other - (name extension)

10/27/2017: Other - (name extension)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/27/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department H - Hon. Emily Garcia Uhrig; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return / Costs: $120.00 ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: Fidelity Capital Holdings Inc. a California corporation (Assignee); As to: JUDITH BERG (Plaintiff); SANDRA BERG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketAddress for MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN ORR (Defendant) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketAddress for MARY RACHEL ORR (Defendant) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketAssignee of Record's Appointment of Counsel; Filed by: Fidelity Capital Holdings Inc. a California Corporation DBA Fidelity Creditor Service Inc. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Fidelity Capital Holdings Inc. a California Corporation DBA Fidelity Creditor Service Inc. (Assignee); As to: MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN ORR (Defendant); MARY RACHEL ORR (Defendant); Costs: 402.00; Interest: 261.43; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Assignment of Judgment: Status Date changed from 11/16/2017 to 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketRECEIVED/PENDING: FEE WAIVER AS TO: MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN ORR, RE: ANS RECEIVED/PENDING: FEE WAIVER AS TO: MOLLY ELISABETH ALDEN ORR, RE: ANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketRECEIVED/PENDING: FEE WAIVER AS TO: MARY RACHEL ORR, RE: ANSWER RECEIVED/PENDING: FEE WAIVER AS TO: MARY RACHEL ORR, RE: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketA/C - ANSWER FILING REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketA/C - ANSWER FILING REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) AS TO PLAINTIFF + PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) AS TO PLAINTIFF + RE: ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 09/12/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less