Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2020 at 13:53:31 (UTC).

BELSHIRE NORTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION VS RENE FLORES, II

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 BELSHIRE NORTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against RENE FLORES, II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8685

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELSHIRE NORTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Defendants

FLORES RENE II

FLORES RENE RAUL II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HESS EDWARD WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/10/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

1/10/2020: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

1/10/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/10/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Request for Judgment for Continuing Post-Complaint Damages

1/10/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Request for Judgment for Continuing Post-Complaint Damages

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

1/10/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court After Default

2/4/2020: Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court After Default

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

3/9/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/20/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Raul Flores, II (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Belshire North Condominium Association against Defendant Rene Raul Flores II on the Complaint filed by Belshire North Condominium Association on 09/19/2019 for the principal amount of $4,151.75, attorney fees of $1,150.00, and costs of $340.95 for a total of $5,642.70.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketJudgment Judgment by Court After Default; Signed and Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Raul Flores, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Rene Raul Flores, II (Defendant): Middle Name: Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Flores, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Rene Flores, II; On the Complaint filed by Belshire North Condominium Association on 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Flores, II (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Flores, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Flores, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Belshire North Condominium Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Flores, II (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less