This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2019 at 07:36:43 (UTC).

BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATES, LLC VS KAREN SMITH, M.D.H., DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATES, LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against KAREN SMITH, M D H , DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1331

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATES LLC DBA ROSE VILLA

Respondents

SMITH M.D.H. DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH KAREN

THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REAGAN MARK

Respondent Attorney

GILL KIRIN K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

4/15/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition (name extension) - Petition Complaint to Contest "A" Citation and Proposed Assessment of Civil Penalty

4/15/2019: Petition (name extension) - Petition Complaint to Contest "A" Citation and Proposed Assessment of Civil Penalty

Summons - Summons on Petition

4/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/15/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet AMENDED

5/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

General Denial - General Denial

6/14/2019: General Denial - General Denial

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

8/19/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Vacate Hearing And set Trial Date

7/26/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Vacate Hearing And set Trial Date

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/6/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Trial Date

11/1/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Trial Date

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • Hearing07/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial scheduled for 11/07/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order To Continue Trial Date: Status Date changed from 11/01/2019 to 11/01/2019; Name Extension changed from Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Trial Date to To Continue Trial Date; As To Parties changed from Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner) to Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Karen Smith, M.D.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Respondent); The California Department of Public Health (Respondent); As to: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/23/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial scheduled for 11/07/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Mark Reagan (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketAddress for Mark Reagan (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Karen Smith, M.D.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/17/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet AMENDED; Filed by: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint to Contest "A" Citation and Proposed Assessment of Civil Penalty scheduled for 08/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketPetition Complaint to Contest "A" Citation and Proposed Assessment of Civil Penalty; Filed by: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Karen Smith, M.D.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Respondent); The California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Karen Smith, M.D.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Respondent); The California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Bell Villa Care Associates, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Karen Smith, M.D.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Respondent); The California Department of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gill, Kirin K