This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2018 at 15:35:24 (UTC).

BELFOR USA GROUP, INC. VS DOMINIQUE COHEN

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 BELFOR USA GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMINIQUE COHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2656

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELFOR USA GROUP INC.

2920 E. White Star Ave,

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendants

TRUSTEES OF THE BREZNER TRUST

15322 Mulholland Dr,

Los Angeles, CA 90077

COHEN DOMINIQUE FKA DOMINIQUE COHEN-BREZNER

Los Angeles, CA 90077

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/6/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/5/2017: Unknown

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

10/5/2017: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Unknown

9/6/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/6/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/6/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

9/6/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/2/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

[Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Hearing date requested is to far out for clerk to approve]

6/2/2017: [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Hearing date requested is to far out for clerk to approve]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Hearing date requested is to far out for clerk to approve

5/25/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Hearing date requested is to far out for clerk to approve

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/17/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Postponement

5/17/2017: Notice of Postponement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 11/06/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/06/2017 to 11/06/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 11/06/2017 ; Status Date changed from 11/06/2017 to 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 11/06/2017 ; Status Date changed from 11/06/2017 to 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Dominique Cohen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Trustees of the Brezner trust (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/21/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dominique Cohen (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/21/2017; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dominique Cohen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011577 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less