This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 23:46:38 (UTC).

BEL AIR WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS JASENKA FEARN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 BEL AIR WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JASENKA FEARN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2280

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEL AIR WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

3007 Washington Blvd

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendants

FEARN JASENKA AKA JAY FEARN

Los Angeles, CA 90024

HERFEH CAME AKA KEVIN HERFEH

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/28/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/28/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/28/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/23/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/23/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 05/23/2017

5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/7/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/7/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/28/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/28/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Bel Air West Homeowners Association against Defendant Jasenka Fearn AKA Jay Fearn and Defendant Came Herfeh AKA Kevin Herfeh on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bel Air West Homeowners Association on 03/22/2017 for the principal amount of $1,400.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $1,490.00, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bel Air West Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Jasenka Fearn (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Bel Air West Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Came Herfeh (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170322E0790 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170322E0790 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bel Air West Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Jasenka Fearn (Defendant); Came Herfeh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less