This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 10:31:41 (UTC).

BEL AIR INTERNET LLC VS GREENSTEM ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 BEL AIR INTERNET LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREENSTEM ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5483

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEL AIR INTERNET LLC

Defendant

GREENSTEM ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HACKLER FLYNN & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Breach of Contract

12/10/2015: Complaint - Breach of Contract

Summons

12/10/2015: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

12/17/2015: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

(name extension) - REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

3/16/2016: (name extension) - REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

Request for Dismissal

4/4/2016: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - not entered-Previously Entered 3-16-16

1/18/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - not entered-Previously Entered 3-16-16

Declaration (name extension) - of Jon Greenholtz in support of request for court judgment

2/3/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Jon Greenholtz in support of request for court judgment

Notice (name extension) - of rejection-Application for default judgment by court

2/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - of rejection-Application for default judgment by court

Declaration (name extension) - of Angela Moreno in support of request for court judgment

2/3/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Angela Moreno in support of request for court judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Not Entered- Previously Entered 3-16-16

6/6/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Not Entered- Previously Entered 3-16-16

Minute Order

6/12/2017: Minute Order

Judgment

9/15/2017: Judgment

Minute Order - (OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File De...)

9/15/2017: Minute Order - (OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File De...)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/15/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - supplemental

9/15/2017: Declaration (name extension) - supplemental

Declaration (name extension) - 585

9/15/2017: Declaration (name extension) - 585

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

12/14/2017: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 09/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/10/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 09/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2018; Result Type to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/15/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2016
  • Docket*DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 FROM THE COMPLAINT ONLY* *DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 FROM THE COMPLAINT ONLY*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BEL AIR INTERNET LLC on 12/10/2015, Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/12/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketOSC SET 12/10/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BEL AIR INTERNET LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENSTEM ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEL AIR INTERNET LLC is a litigant