This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2021 at 06:31:31 (UTC).

BEL AIR INTERNET, LLC VS CINELOU FILMS, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 BEL AIR INTERNET, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CINELOU FILMS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2838

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEL AIR INTERNET LLC

Defendant

CINELOU FILMS LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/6/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/6/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/6/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/3/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/26/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2020

10/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

8/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bel Air Internet, LLC on 03/06/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Bel Air Internet, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/13/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bel Air Internet, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Cinelou Films, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEL AIR INTERNET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CINELOU FILMS LLC is a litigant