Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 07:51:04 (UTC).

BEACON VIEW LLC VS CARTER, THOMAS E.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2012 BEACON VIEW LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARTER, THOMAS E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0936

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACON VIEW LLC

Defendant

CARTER THOMAS E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK, FRED M

Defendant Attorney

BELL, ANTHONY E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • OSC SET 03/11/13, 0830 AM, DEPT. 85, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 02/25/13 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO COURT'S RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE FILED BY PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • COUNTER MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 2 HR(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/19/12, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACON VIEW LLC is a litigant