This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 16:06:15 (UTC).

BEACH FINANCIAL LLC VS IRIS JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 BEACH FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IRIS JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2295

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACH FINANCIAL LLC DBA PAYDAY EXPRESS

Defendant

JOHNSON IRIS

Los Angeles, CA 90044

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/13/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/13/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/23/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/18/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 07/18/2017

7/18/2017: Minute Order of 07/18/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - No Service

7/17/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET FROM COURTROOM

5/18/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET FROM COURTROOM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/18/2017 to 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/18/2017 to 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Beach Financial LLC DBA Payday Express against Defendant Iris Johnson on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Beach Financial LLC on 03/23/2017 for the principal amount of $410.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $480.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Beach Financial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Iris Johnson (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) RESET FROM COURTROOM; Filed by: Beach Financial LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Beach Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Beach Financial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Iris Johnson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011059 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less