This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 05:00:30 (UTC).

B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC VS MIRANDA, SEVERINA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 B D NORTON PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIRANDA, SEVERINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6313

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC

B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC DBA ABC MOBILE HOME PARK

Defendant

MIRANDA SEVERINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREBOW & RUBIN LLP

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Mortgage Foreclosure

5/20/2016: Complaint - Mortgage Foreclosure

Other - (name extension) - NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR DECLARATION OF ABANDONMENT

5/20/2016: Other - (name extension) - NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR DECLARATION OF ABANDONMENT

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO SEVERINA MIRANDA AND NORTON BERNARD

7/12/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO SEVERINA MIRANDA AND NORTON BERNARD

Order - Dismissal

11/20/2017: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/20/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/20/2017

11/20/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 11/20/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/20/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AS TO SEVERINA MIRANDA AND NORTON BERNARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/20/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 05/20/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketOther - NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR DECLARATION OF ABANDONMENT; Filed by: B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC is a litigant