This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 07:54:58 (UTC).

BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AN VS FLORES, RAMONA M.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2012 BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORES, RAMONA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES K. HAHN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0908

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES K. HAHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AND APPLIANCES INC.

Defendant

FLORES RAMONA M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 12A00908 TO ING12SS0908

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEG , HON. JAMES K. HAHN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM WEG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FLORES, RAMONA M.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SM. HEARING SET FOR 05/30/12 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. WEG.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AND APPLIANCE is a litigant