Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 00:19:12 (UTC).

BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION VS PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3560

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

Defendant

PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOW RON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Baxter Healthcare Corporation on 04/29/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Baxter Healthcare Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Gardens Medical Center LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/13/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Gardens Medical Center LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Gardens Medical Center LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Gardens Medical Center LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Baxter Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW RON