This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:15:47 (UTC).

BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING VS CEVA LOGISTICS , INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 BAXTER, BAILEY, ASSOCIATES, INC , A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CEVA LOGISTICS , INC , A WASHINGTON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1008

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES INC. A CORPORATION AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING

Defendants

CEVA LOGISTICS INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

MIDWEST EXPRESS INC. A OHIO CORPORATION

WYNN LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/9/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

3/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/20/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Pursuant to the Request for Dismissal filed by BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING on 08/09/2019, the Complaint filed by BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING on 03/20/2019 is dismissed with prejudice.; The following event(s) is/are advanced to this date and vacated: 03/25/2020 8:30 AM Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 in Department F43; Prejudice Type changed from Without Prejudice to With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING (Plaintiff); As to: CEVA LOGISTICS , INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION (Defendant); MIDWEST EXPRESS INC., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant); WYNN LOGISTICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING on 03/20/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING (Plaintiff); As to: CEVA LOGISTICS , INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION (Defendant); MIDWEST EXPRESS INC., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant); WYNN LOGISTICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING (Plaintiff); As to: CEVA LOGISTICS , INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION (Defendant); MIDWEST EXPRESS INC., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant); WYNN LOGISTICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF STEPHENS TRUCKING (Plaintiff); As to: CEVA LOGISTICS , INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION (Defendant); MIDWEST EXPRESS INC., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant); WYNN LOGISTICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midwest Express Acquisition Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where CEVA Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT RICHARD