This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2019 at 05:11:52 (UTC).

BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF K TAHOE TRUCKING, INC., VS MICHAEL C. COX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 BAXTER, BAILEY, ASSOCIATES, INC , A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF K TAHOE TRUCKING, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL C COX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7091

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES INC. A CORPORATION AN ASSIGNEE OF K TAHOE TRUCKING INC.

Defendants

COX MICHAEL C DBA JPM LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;

INTERNATIONAL MANUFACTURING & LOGISTICS LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

ONESOURCE IML A COLORADO CORPORATION;

ENZACTA USA LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

COLORADO QUALITY PRODUCTS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

ROTHMAN ANTHONY JASON

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/24/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

10/18/2019: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Michael C Cox (Defendant); Colorado Quality Products, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); Enzacta USA, LLC, A Wyoming Limited Liability Company; (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Colorado Quality Products, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); As to: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Michael C Cox (Defendant); Colorado Quality Products, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); Enzacta USA, LLC, A Wyoming Limited Liability Company; (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Michael C Cox (Defendant); Colorado Quality Products, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); Enzacta USA, LLC, A Wyoming Limited Liability Company; (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of K Tahoe Trucking, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Michael C Cox (Defendant); Colorado Quality Products, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); Enzacta USA, LLC, A Wyoming Limited Liability Company; (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT RICHARD