This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:44:29 (UTC).

BARRY LEVIN VS BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AND APPLIANCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 BARRY LEVIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AND APPLIANCES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1974

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVIN BARRY

Defendant

BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AND APPLIANCES INC.

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Jack Farasat

7/27/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Jack Farasat

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2018

7/27/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/27/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/11/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/21/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 07/27/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Jack Farasat; Filed by: Bay Cities Discount Kitchen and Appliances, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Barry Levin (Plaintiff); As to: Bay Cities Discount Kitchen and Appliances, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/28/2018; Service Cost: 98.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Barry Levin (Plaintiff); As to: Bay Cities Discount Kitchen and Appliances, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY CITIES DISCOUNT KITCHEN AND APPLIANCE is a litigant