This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:00:53 (UTC).

BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC VS SERRANO, MARTHA

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SERRANO, MARTHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7560

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

VILLEGAS OSCAR

MARTINEZ SERGIO

SERRANO MARTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES THOMPSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 09/14/16 AT 01:30 P M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 09/14/16 AT 01:30 P M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 09/14/16 AT 01:30 P M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/14/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER(CIVIL CODE PRO. 170.6) FILED PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER(CIVIL CODE PRO. 170.6) FILED AGAINST JUDGE DEBORAH CHRISTIAN BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • MEMO TO SET FOR TRIAL PENDING ON 170.6 MEMO TO SET FOR TRIAL PENDING ON 170.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6) AGAINST JUDGE DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6 COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • OSC SET 01/03/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC is a litigant