This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2016 at 07:40:25 (UTC).

BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC VS NAVARRO, FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 07/27/2016 BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NAVARRO, FRANCISCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8438

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

NAVARRO FRANCISCO

GARCIA PEDRO

GLORIA NAVARRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES P THOMPSON

Defendant Attorney

JAVIER BELTRAN (SBN 240416)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR FICTITIOUS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE UNNAMED TENANTS FILED -MAILED 08/02/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY: PEDRO GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • OSC SET 01/23/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC is a litigant