This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2019 at 04:10:06 (UTC).

BARELA, DAVE VS. MARISAS RESTAURANT

Case Summary

On 08/03/2012 BARELA, DAVE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARISAS RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P. RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2469

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL P. RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARELA DAVE

Defendants

MARISAS RESTAURANT

FIDEL PALOMA

Cross Plaintiff

PALOMO FIDEL DBA MARISA'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT

Cross Defendant

SORAYA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA - DAVE H. HITCH ESQ

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/29/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM WH 12C02469 TO LAM12CW2469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 007 , HON. DANIEL P. RAMIREZ, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: REVIEW OF COURT FILE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 10-10-12 IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ENCLOSED IS AN AMENDED COPY OF THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED ON 01-18-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FIDEL PALOMO DBA MARISA'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketADVANCE (NONREFUNDABLE) JURY FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $150 RECEIVED FROM EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA ON BEHALF OF (MARISAS RESTAURANT) , RECEIPT # WH541556003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF FIDEL PALOMO DBA MARISA'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MARISAS RESTAURANT;FIDEL PALOMA . CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT FIDEL PALOMO DBA MARISA'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT . CROSS-DEFENDANT SORAYA LLC . RECEIPT # WH541556002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN WH541556009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/13 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. CMR . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORAYA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HITCH DAVE H. ESQ.