Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2018 at 10:27:47 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS ZVI, MICAH D KEREN

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZVI, MICAH D KEREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4815

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

ZVI MICAH D KEREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE, A.P.C. - ESTHER E HYUN

Attorney at SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE, A.P.C.

HYUN ESTHER E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) against Defendant (ZVI, MICAH D KEREN) on the Complaint filed by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE on 07/12/2017 for the principal amount of $2,465.99 and costs of $294.50 for a total of $2,760.49.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: ESTHER E HYUN (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: MICAH D KEREN ZVI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Default entered as to MICAH D KEREN ZVI; On the Complaint filed by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE on 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Other - Calculation Of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Other - Non-Military Service; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: MICAH D KEREN ZVI (Defendant); Service Date: 09/11/17; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371073. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HYUN, ESTHER E