This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 19:59:30 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS BARBOSA, ALVIN

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARBOSA, ALVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5141

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

BARBOSA ALVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE - LORI BRODBECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

BRODBECK LORI

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/17/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration of Mailing

10/17/2017: Declaration of Mailing

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/16/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Other - (name extension) - Exhibit 1

4/10/2018: Other - (name extension) - Exhibit 1

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/10/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

4/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Re: Waiver of Interest Excess of 0% and Attorney Fees

4/10/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Re: Waiver of Interest Excess of 0% and Attorney Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Of Non-Military Status

4/10/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Of Non-Military Status

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

4/10/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Judgment

5/4/2018: Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/15/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/15/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: ALVIN BARBOSA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) against Defendant (BARBOSA, ALVIN) on the Complaint filed by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE on 03/14/2017 for the principal amount of $1,720.57 and costs of $348.50 for a total of $2,069.07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 to 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration Re: Waiver of Interest Excess of 0% and Attorney Fees; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration Of Non-Military Status; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Other - Exhibit 1; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ; Default not entered as to ALVIN BARBOSA; On the Complaint filed by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE on 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: ALVIN BARBOSA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: ALVIN BARBOSA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/12/17; Service Cost: 123.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: ALVIN BARBOSA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/27/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371007. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less