Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 07:54:16 (UTC).

BANKERS AUTO ACCEPTANCE CORP. VS JAILE GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 BANKERS AUTO ACCEPTANCE CORP filed an Other lawsuit against JAILE GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8672

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKERS AUTO ACCEPTANCE CORP. DBA TIME FINANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GARCIA JAILE AKA JAILE A. GARCIA AKA JAILE ADOLFO GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELDER WILLIAM NORMAN

 

Court Documents

Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum for Default Judgment

12/19/2019: Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum for Default Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of CCP 1033

12/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of CCP 1033

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/19/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Hearing03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jaile Garcia (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/15/2019; Service Cost: 66.01; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMemorandum for Default Judgment; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of CCP 1033; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Jaile Garcia; On the Complaint filed by Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. on 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp., does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jaile Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jaile Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jaile Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jaile Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less