This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 03:50:50 (UTC).

BANK OF HOPE VS ELIZABETH ADRIANE ANTILLA

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 BANK OF HOPE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELIZABETH ADRIANE ANTILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0906

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BANK OF HOPE

BANK OF HOPE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ANTILLA ELIZABETH ADRIANE AKA ELIZABETH ADRIANE RELLO

Cross Plaintiff

ANTILLA ELIZABETH ADRIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

AGAWA THOMAS

GIZER SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

SLATER CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/13/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order

3/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action

3/9/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

6/17/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint

6/17/2019: Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

5/1/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

5/1/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

5/1/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/28/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/28/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/28/2019: Complaint - Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by BANK OF HOPE, a California Corporation on 03/12/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by BANK OF HOPE, a California Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketAddress for Scott Gizer (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/05/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: BANK OF HOPE, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Filed by: BANK OF HOPE, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAmended Amended Complaint; Filed by: BANK OF HOPE, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Adriane Antilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BANK OF HOPE (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Adriane Antilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BANK OF HOPE (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Adriane Antilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BANK OF HOPE (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Adriane Antilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00906    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

(CCP § 1282.1, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant Bank of Hope’s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Proposed Order pursuant to the parties’ stipulation to be signed by the Court.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On January 28, 2019, Plaintiff Bank of Hope (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract and unjust enrichment against Defendant Elizabeth Adriane Antilla aka Elizabeth Adriane Rello (“Defendant”). On March 12, 2019, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint.

On May 1, 2019, Defendant filed an Answer and a Cross-Complaint against Plaintiff for breach of contract, unlawful payroll deduction, failure to pay minimum wage and all wages earned, failure to provide rest breaks, failure to provide meal periods, failure to provide accurate, written wage statements, and waiting time penalties.

On June 17, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (the “Motion”). The Motion was made pursuant to a General Agreement to Arbitrate Disputes (the “Agreement”) signed by Defendant on November 5, 2017 and by Plaintiff on November 6, 2017. (Mot., Kim Decl., ¶¶ 5-6, Exh. B.) No opposition was filed.

On February 14, 2020, the parties filed a Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order for Binding Arbitration (the “Stipulation”) indicating that they agreed to submit the entirety of the action to arbitration pursuant to the terms of the Agreement, to stay the action pending resolution of the arbitration, and to have the hearing on the instant Motion be placed off calendar. (2/14/20 Stipulation.) Accordingly, the hearing on Plaintiff’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. (Id.)

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant Bank of Hope’s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Proposed Order pursuant to the parties’ stipulation to be signed by the Court.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.