This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 07:59:04 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA VS ASANTE, FRANK K

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASANTE, FRANK K. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6564

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA N. A.

Defendant

ASANTE FRANK K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NELSON & KENNARD - ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Summons

3/29/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/12/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ASANTE, FRANK K) ON 4/27/2017 . COSTS OF $ 72.00

5/1/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ASANTE, FRANK K) ON 4/27/2017 . COSTS OF $ 72.00

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RE: THE ANSWER .

5/26/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RE: THE ANSWER .

Notice (name extension) - OF DATE, TIME AND PLACE OF COURT TRIAL

6/5/2017: Notice (name extension) - OF DATE, TIME AND PLACE OF COURT TRIAL

Substitution of Attorney

3/20/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Exhibit List

4/13/2018: Exhibit List

Notice (name extension)

4/13/2018: Notice (name extension)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR MAY 25, 2018

5/23/2018: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR MAY 25, 2018

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

5/23/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Order (name extension) - Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial Scheduled for 05/25/18

5/23/2018: Order (name extension) - Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial Scheduled for 05/25/18

Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINU...)

5/23/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINU...)

Notice (name extension) - of Date, Time and Place of Continued Trial

7/16/2018: Notice (name extension) - of Date, Time and Place of Continued Trial

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

8/23/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

10/31/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

2/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA on 03/29/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/05/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of date, time and place of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal; Filed by: (BANK OF AMERICA) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 10/31/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR MAY 25, 2018: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/23/2018 to 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (ASANTE, FRANK K) . RECEIPT # NOR508390018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED RE: THE ANSWER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 05/25/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ASANTE, FRANK K) ON 4/27/2017 . COSTS OF $ 72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371086. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (BANK OF AMERICA) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less