Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 00:38:53 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS STEPHEN L CHESNEY

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHEN L CHESNEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7341

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

CHESNEY STEPHEN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE FLINT C

Defendant Attorney

CHESNEY STEPHEN L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/23/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/27/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of trial

12/3/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of trial

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

12/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

11/25/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

11/25/2019: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Military Status

9/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Military Status

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 06/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: 06/06/2022; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of trial; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant); As to: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant); Service Date: 09/24/2019; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Non-Military Status; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN L CHESNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less