This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 22:54:09 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS SANG W CHOI

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANG W CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7149

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

CHOI SANG W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

6/16/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

2/11/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

2/13/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Bank of America N.A. against Defendant SANG W CHOI on the Complaint filed by Bank of America N.A. on 12/05/2019 for the principal amount of $15,079.98 and costs of $435.00 for a total of $15,514.98.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANG W CHOI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANG W CHOI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to SANG W CHOI; On the Complaint filed by Bank of America N.A. on 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANG W CHOI (Defendant); Service Date: 12/11/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANG W CHOI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANG W CHOI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANG W CHOI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less