This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 08:10:13 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS SANDEL, GREGORY V

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDEL, GREGORY V. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9644

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N. A.

Defendant

SANDEL GREGORY V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYUN ESTHER E.

Defendant Attorney

ALTHOLZ ANDREW P. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Notice of Settlement)

10/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Notice of Settlement)

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))

9/24/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/26/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL

7/9/2018: Notice (name extension) - REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL

Notice (name extension) - OF TRIAL

7/9/2018: Notice (name extension) - OF TRIAL

Answer

7/25/2017: Answer

Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

7/25/2017: Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

7/7/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/24/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/19/2017: Complaint

Summons

5/19/2017: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA N. A. on 05/19/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Notice of Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Notice of Settlement scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Failure to File Notice of Settlement scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 09/24/2018; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 07/26/2018; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNotice REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL; Filed by: (BANK OF AMERICA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY V SANDEL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (SANDEL, GREGORY V) . RECEIPT # CHA511599014 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL IS SET FOR 07/26/18 AT 08:30A M. IN DEPT. F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET ON 05/04/20 HAS BEEN VACATED. NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SANDEL, GREGORY V) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 05/04/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853061. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (BANK OF AMERICA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HYUN, ESTHER E