Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 01:54:45 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS NOEL C BURROWES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NOEL C BURROWES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7137

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

BURROWES NOEL C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Order (name extension) - Order ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

11/2/2020: Order (name extension) - Order ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order for Settlement Agreement

11/2/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order for Settlement Agreement

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6: Filed By: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Bank of America N.A. on 12/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Order for Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: NOEL C BURROWES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/20/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: NOEL C BURROWES (Defendant); Service Date: 12/24/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: NOEL C BURROWES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: NOEL C BURROWES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: NOEL C BURROWES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less