This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2019 at 08:41:39 (UTC).

BAILEY, RAYMOND VS SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDA

Case Summary

On 10/09/2014 BAILEY, RAYMOND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGIA KEZIOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8293

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGIA KEZIOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAILEY RAYMOND

VAN NUYS FINANCIAL {ASSIGNEE}

Defendants

SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL NO

JABARIN KARIN KAMEL DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL

SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL NON CALIFORNIA CORP

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

9/22/2017: Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Partially Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 175.00; Interest Credits: 8.12; Principal Credits: 2,109.47; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO VAN NUYS FINANCIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 150.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. OVER THE COUNTER . RECEIPT # DOW402835013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. GEORGIA KEZIOS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY KARIN KAMEL JABARIN FOR SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE AND HIMSELF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (BAILEY, RAYMOND) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS) INC DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) NON CALIFORNIA CORP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/22/14 . FOR (BAILEY, RAYMOND) . AGAINST (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS) INC DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) NON CALIFORNIA CORP , (JABARIN, KARIN KAMEL) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) . PRINCIPAL $ 2004.59 . COSTS $ 115.00 . TOTAL $ 2119.59 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS) INC DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) NON CALIFORNIA CORP , (JABARIN, KARIN KAMEL) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS) INC DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) NON CALIFORNIA CORP BY SUB-SERVING VANESSA, FLOOR MANAGER, FEM. HISP. 5'4, DARK HAIR, DARK EYES . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JABARIN, KARIN KAMEL) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) BY SUB-SERVING VANESSA, FLOOR MANAGER, FEM HISP, 5'4, DARK HAIR, DRK EYES . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JABARIN, KARIN KAMEL) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) BY SUB-SERVING VANESSA, FL MNGR . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN DOW497910003. HEARING SET FOR 12/22/14 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VAN NUYS FINANCIAL is a litigant