This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 01:49:10 (UTC).

AYANA WOODS, ET AL. VS HUGO ORELLANA JAIMES

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 AYANA WOODS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUGO ORELLANA JAIMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2200

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WOODS AYANA

WOODS MALACHI

Defendant

JAIMES HUGO ORELLANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

JOACHIM LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/6/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/31/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

12/31/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

12/31/2020: Answer - Answer

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

5/18/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

5/18/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

5/18/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

5/18/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

5/18/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

5/18/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

6/21/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

6/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

6/23/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

6/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/9/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/18/2021

8/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/18/2021

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ayana Woods, et al. on 03/06/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ayana Woods and Malachi Woods as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/18/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/14/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Hugo Orellana Jaimes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Ayana Woods (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Orellana Jaimes (Defendant); Mailing Date: 03/13/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ayana Woods (Plaintiff); Malachi Woods (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Orellana Jaimes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ayana Woods (Plaintiff); Malachi Woods (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Orellana Jaimes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ayana Woods (Plaintiff); Malachi Woods (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Orellana Jaimes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Malachi: Status Date changed from 04/06/2020 to 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC02200 Hearing Date: August 2, 2021 Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: (1)\r\nMOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF MALACHI WOODS TO RESPOND TO FORM\r\nINTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

(2)\r\nMOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF MALACHI WOODS TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL\r\nINTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING PARTY: Defendant\r\nHugo Orellana Jaimes

\r\n\r\n

RESP. PARTY: None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 2030.290)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant Hugo Orellana Jaimes’ (1)\r\nMotion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Malachi Woods to Respond to Form\r\nInterrogatories, Set One, and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Malachi\r\nWoods to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One, are GRANTED. Plaintiff\r\nMalachi is ordered to serve verified responses without objections within thirty\r\n(30) days of notice of this order. Defendant’s requests for sanctions are also\r\nGRANTED in the amount of $723.30 to be paid to Defendant’s counsel within\r\nthirty (30) days of notice of this order.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SERVICE: \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nProof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nCorrect Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\n16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 28,\r\n2021 [ ] Late [X]\r\nNone

\r\n\r\n

REPLY: None filed as\r\nof July 28, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

I. \r\nBackground\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On March 6, 2020, Plaintiffs Ayana Woods (“Ayana”) and\r\nminor Plaintiff Malachi Woods (“Malachi”) filed the instant action against\r\nDefendant Hugo Orellana Jaimes (“Defendant”). Defendant filed an Answer on\r\nDecember 31, 2020.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant filed the instant (1) Motion for Order\r\nCompelling Plaintiff Malachi Woods to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One,\r\nand Request for Sanctions and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Malachi\r\nWoods to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions\r\n(collectively, the “Motions”) on May 18, 2021. No opposition was filed.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

II. \r\nLegal\r\nStandard & Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

A. Form Interrogatories

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

A party must respond to interrogatories within 30 days\r\nafter service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.260, subd. (a).) If a party to whom\r\ninterrogatories are directed does not provide timely responses, the requesting\r\nparty may move for an order compelling responses to the discovery. (Code Civ.\r\nProc., § 2030.290, subd. (b).) The party also waives the\r\nright to make any objections, including one based on privilege or work-product\r\nprotection. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (a).) There is no time limit\r\nfor a motion to compel responses to interrogatories other than the cut-off on\r\nhearing discovery motions 15 days before trial. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.020,\r\nsubd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290.) No meet and confer efforts are required\r\nbefore filing a motion to compel responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc.,\r\n§ 2030.290; Sinaiko Healthcare\r\nConsulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th\r\n390, 411.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Here,\r\nDefendant served Plaintiff Malachi with Form Interrogatories, Set One, and\r\nSpecial Interrogatories, Set One, on December 30, 2020 via email. (Motions,\r\nJoachim Decls., ¶¶ 3, Exhs. A.) Although not procedurally required, Defendant’s\r\ncounsel sent Plaintiff Malachi’s counsel a letter regarding the overdue\r\nresponses on February 15, 2021. (Id. at ¶¶ 4, Exhs. B.) As of the date\r\nthese Motions were filed, Plaintiff Malachi had not served any responses. (Id.\r\nat ¶¶ 5.) Thus, Defendant is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff Malachi to\r\nserve verified responses without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §\r\n2030.290.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

B. Sanctions

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Code of Civil Procedure section 2023.030, subdivision (a)\r\nprovides, in pertinent part, that the court may impose a monetary sanction on a\r\nparty engaging in the misuse of the discovery process to pay the reasonable\r\nexpenses, including attorney’s fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that\r\nconduct. A misuse of the discovery process includes failing to respond or\r\nsubmit to an authorized method of discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010,\r\nsubd. (d).)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The Court finds Plaintiff Malachi’s\r\nfailure to respond to Defendant’s discovery requests a misuse of the discovery\r\nprocess.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant requests sanctions of\r\n$1,323.30 based on four hours of attorney time billed at $300.00 per hour and\r\ntwo filing fees of $61.65. (Motions, Joachim Decl., ¶¶ 7.) However, the amount\r\nsought is excessive given the simplicity of these nearly identical motions and\r\nthe lack of opposition and reply. The Court finds $723.30, based on two hours\r\nof attorney time and two filing fees, to be reasonable. Sanctions are to be\r\npaid to Defendant’s counsel within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

III. \r\nConclusion\r\n& Order

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant\r\nHugo Orellana Jaimes’ (1) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Malachi Woods\r\nto Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and (2) Motion for Order\r\nCompelling Plaintiff Malachi Woods to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set\r\nOne, are GRANTED. Plaintiff Malachi is ordered to serve verified responses\r\nwithout objections within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Defendant’s\r\nrequests for sanctions are also GRANTED in the amount of $723.30 to be paid to\r\nDefendant’s counsel within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party is ordered to give\r\nnotice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH