This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:28:25 (UTC).

AVOLONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC VS MAHA ALNAMI

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 AVOLONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAHA ALNAMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0947

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVOLONBAY COMMUNITIES INC

Defendant

ALNAMI MAHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUONG TIFFANY DANG

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/26/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/26/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

9/26/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Possession

9/28/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession

Writ - Return

10/18/2017: Writ - Return

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/14/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Maha Alnami)

9/15/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Maha Alnami)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/15/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Complaint

9/14/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

9/14/2017: Summons - on Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Avolonbay Communities, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Maha Alnami (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Avolonbay Communities, INC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 82.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to Maha Alnami; On the Complaint filed by Avolonbay Communities, INC on 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Avolonbay Communities, INC against Defendant Maha Alnami on the Complaint filed by Avolonbay Communities, INC on 09/14/2017 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 4181 Kling Street #24, Burbank, CA 91505 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is not cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is not forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Avolonbay Communities, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Maha Alnami (Defendant); Service Date: 09/15/2017; Service Cost: 72.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Avolonbay Communities, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Maha Alnami (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Avolonbay Communities, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUONG TIFFANY DANG