This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 00:43:17 (UTC).

AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM, LLC VS DARLENE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DARLENE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5144

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC

Defendant

WILLIAMS DARLENE

Long Beach, CA 90804

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KARPEL JEFFREY ELIOT

DEAN KRISTI W

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion for Admissions be Deemed Admitted

11/13/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion for Admissions be Deemed Admitted

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/16/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Entry of Dismissal Or, In The Alternative, Judgment and Order Thereon

4/19/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Entry of Dismissal Or, In The Alternative, Judgment and Order Thereon

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

9/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

6/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 06/25/2020

6/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 06/25/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

6/20/2019: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Answer - Answer

2/20/2019: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/20/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/21/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/21/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/21/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/21/2018: Complaint - Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Avis Rent A Car System, LLC on 12/21/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Civil Code of Procedure Section 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Entry of Dismissal Or, In The Alternative, Judgment and Order Thereon: Status Date changed from 04/19/2021 to 04/19/2021; As To Parties changed from Darlene Williams (Defendant) to Darlene Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darlene Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Motion for Admissions be Deemed Admitted; Filed by: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darlene Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darlene Williams (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/21/2019; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darlene Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darlene Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darlene Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC15144    Hearing Date: September 09, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed. September 9, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Avis Rent a Car System, LLC v. Williams COMPL. FILED: 12-21-18

CASE NUMBER: 18STLC15144 DISC. C/O: 03-28-21

NOTICE: NO DISC. MOT. C/O: 04-12-21

TRIAL DATE: 04-27-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED AND FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Avis Rent a Car System, LLC

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Avis Rent a Car System, LLC’s Motion for Order that Request for Admissions be Deemed Admitted and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of September 3, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of September 3, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On December 21, 2018, Plaintiff Avis Rent a Car System, LLC (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract against Defendant Darlene Williams (“Defendant”). On February 20, 2019, Defendant filed an Answer, in pro per.

On April 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Order that Request for Admissions be Deemed Admitted and for Sanctions (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed. 18STLC15144

At the initial hearing on June 25, 2020, the Court noted that the Motion was not accompanied by a proof of service. (6/25/20 Minute Order.) Plaintiff was also ordered to serve Defendant with the original requests for admission within 20 days of the Court’s order. (6/25/20 Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order.) The Court ordered Plaintiff to file and serve supplemental papers demonstrating compliance with the Court’s order and warned that failure to do so could result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

To date, Plaintiff has not filed any supplemental papers. Accordingly, the Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Avis Rent a Car System, LLC’s Motion for Order that Request for Admissions be Deemed Admitted and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARPEL JEFFREY ELIOT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN KRISTI W. ESQ.