Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 01:08:14 (UTC).

AVETISYAN, GAYANE VS DAVOODI MASIHI, VARTAN

Case Summary

On 10/06/2015 AVETISYAN, GAYANE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVOODI MASIHI, VARTAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY THORNTON HOUSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7285

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVETISYAN GAYANE

Defendants

DAVOODI MASIHI VARTAN

SANTOSSIAN ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

BLOCK DENNIS P. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/18/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/18/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (los angeles)

2/5/2018: Writ of Execution - (los angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/11/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/11/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

4/11/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

6/24/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (los angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: GAYANE AVETISYAN (Plaintiff); As to: VARTAN DAVOODI MASIHI (Defendant); ANGEL SANTOSSIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: GAYANE AVETISYAN (Plaintiff); As to: VARTAN DAVOODI MASIHI (Defendant); ANGEL SANTOSSIAN (Defendant); Costs: 1335.00; Interest: 1034.85; Credits: 2930.68; Service Date: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: GAYANE AVETISYAN (Plaintiff); As to: VARTAN DAVOODI MASIHI (Defendant); ANGEL SANTOSSIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (los angeles); Filed by: County: los angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: GAYANE AVETISYAN (Plaintiff); As to: VARTAN DAVOODI MASIHI (Defendant); ANGEL SANTOSSIAN (Defendant); Costs: 1,310.00; Interest: 630.36; Credits: 2,930.68; Service Date: 01/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: GAYANE AVETISYAN (Plaintiff); As to: VARTAN DAVOODI MASIHI (Defendant); ANGEL SANTOSSIAN (Defendant); Type: Partial Satisfaction; Partial Amount: 2,930.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED WITH A COST OF $80.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 85.87 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST (LINES 16 & 17). $ 70.00 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST (LINE 19) $ 2722.81 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT (LINE 15).

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 46.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (DAVOODI MASIHI, VARTAN) , (SANTOSSIAN, ANGEL) ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (DAVOODI MASIHI, VARTAN) . COSTS OF $ 67.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SANTOSSIAN, ANGEL) . COSTS OF $ 67.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 014. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THIS CASE TO A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY KEVIN C. BRAZILE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.