This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2020 at 22:32:19 (UTC).

AVB CERRITOS, LLC VS INDIRA VALDIVIA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 AVB CERRITOS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against INDIRA VALDIVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL BRUGUERA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0425

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL BRUGUERA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVB CERRITOS LLC

Defendant

VALDIVIA INDIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/18/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

3/18/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/17/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Indira Valdivia)

2/28/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Indira Valdivia)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/28/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/26/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/26/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/26/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Writ - Return - Writ - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF

9/2/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 111.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff AVB Cerritos, LLC against Defendant Indira Valdivia on the Complaint filed by AVB Cerritos, LLC on 02/26/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 12651 Artesia Boulevard, #424, Cerritos, CA 90703 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Indira Valdivia; On the Complaint filed by AVB Cerritos, LLC on 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant); Service Date: 03/06/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Paul Bruguera in Department W Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AVB Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Indira Valdivia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sparks, Valerie